Global Patent Index - EP 1256649 A2

EP 1256649 A2 2002-11-13 - Method for operating a jigger and corresponding jigger

Title (en)

Method for operating a jigger and corresponding jigger

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Jiggers und entsprechender Jigger

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faire fonctionner un jigger et jigger correspondant

Publication

EP 1256649 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009743 A

Priority

DE 20108044 U

Abstract (en)

At a jigger (100), to process fabric piecegoods (W) with a treatment fluid, the fluid is moved continuously against the direction of fabric travel. It moves as a counter flow through the gap (31) between the wall of the trough (30) and the fabric deflection drum (20) or the fabric around the drum.

Abstract (de)

Ein Jigger (100) zur Durchführung von Flüssigkeitsbehandlungen an textilen Warenbahnen umfaßt zwei in einem Gehäuse angeordnete im wesentlichen untereinander gleiche, einander parallele Wickelwalzen, zwischen denen die Warenbahn (W) reversierend hin- und herwickelbar ist, sowie einen die Behandlungsflüssigkeit enthaltenden Trog (30) mit einer in dem Trog (30) in dessen unterem Bereich angeordneten Umlenktrommel (20). Der Trog (30) ist in seinem unteren Bereich etwa halbzylindrisch mit einem dem Radius der Umlenktrommel (20) nur wenig übersteigenden Radius ausgebildet. Die Behandlungsflüssigkeit ist auf der dem Zulauf der Warenbahn (W) entgegengesetzten Seite der Umlenktrommel (20) zuführbar, im Gegenstrom zur Warenbahn (W) durch den Spalt (31) zwischen der Wandung des Troges (30) und der Umlenktrommel (20) hindurchleitbar und auf der dem Zulauf der Warenbahn (W) benachbarten Seite der Umlenktrommel (20) abführbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256649 A2 20021113; EP 1256649 A3 20041103; DE 20108044 U1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060318

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI