Global Patent Index - EP 1256660 A1

EP 1256660 A1 2002-11-13 - Method of constructing a steep enbeankement

Title (en)

Method of constructing a steep enbeankement

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erstellung einer Hangsicherung

Title (fr)

Méthode de stabilisation des talus

Publication

EP 1256660 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02013855 A

Priority

  • DK 56396 A
  • EP 97921634 A

Abstract (en)

In the construction of a steep embankment a planar front grid (2) is used, said grid being positioned with a given inclination corresponding to the completed embankment, immediately adjacent the front of the completed embankment. At a point in the earth formation behind the completed embankment an anchor element (5) is placed, and between the front grid (2) and the anchor element (5) one or more fixed anchors (4a, 4b) are established to secure the front grid (2) in relation to the anchor element (5). Furthermore, one or more layers of geo-net (7) are preferably placed or inserted below or above the anchor element (5) and behind the front grid (2). Finally, the area behind the front grid (2) is filled up, whereby the anchor element (5) is covered to provide the earth formation in the completed embankment. In this method is used a universally applicable system comprising a planar front grid, an anchor element and a number of anchor braces or struts, said system being immediately adaptable to a given application. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/00; E02D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/18 (2006.01); E02D 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/0241 (2013.01); E02D 17/18 (2013.01); E02D 29/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256660 A1 20021113; AT 229110 T 20021215; AU 2763697 A 19971205; DE 69717619 D1 20030116; DE 69717619 T2 20030918; DK 0897435 T3 20030324; DK 56396 A 19971211; EP 0897435 A1 19990224; EP 0897435 B1 20021204; NO 320078 B1 20051017; NO 985251 A 19990108; NO 985251 D0 19981110; PL 183988 B1 20020830; PL 329847 A1 19990412; WO 9743489 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-08 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120629

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050614

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 897435

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE