Global Patent Index - EP 1256663 A2

EP 1256663 A2 2002-11-13 - Pieces for modular constructions

Title (en)

Pieces for modular constructions

Title (de)

Einzelteile für modulare Strukturen

Title (fr)

Pièces pour constructions modulaires

Publication

EP 1256663 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02380093 A

Priority

ES 200101036 A

Abstract (en)

Pieces for modular construction, that allow the construction of greenhouses both for industrial and domestic use, as well as of any type of construction, adaptable to any form and size, for which the longitudinal piece has some longitudinal channels (1), and on each circular ends (2) and (3), one female (2) and another male (3), wherein both have some perforations (4) and (5), whilst the end (3) has some truncated conical nipples (7) and the end (2) has some complementary truncated conical perforations (6). For curved constructions the longitudinal pieces are joined by means of a piece (8) which likewise has some channels (9), a central perforation (10) and other perforations (11), as well as truncated conical perforations (12) and (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/19; A01G 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/18 (2006.01); E04C 3/28 (2006.01); E04C 3/32 (2006.01); E04C 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/28 (2013.01); E04B 1/18 (2013.01); E04C 3/32 (2013.01); E04C 2003/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256663 A2 20021113; EP 1256663 A3 20040102; ES 2204231 A1 20040416; ES 2204231 B1 20050716; US 2002162296 A1 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/19 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01G 9/16 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI