Global Patent Index - EP 1256665 A1

EP 1256665 A1 2002-11-13 - Device for realising a roof opening seal

Title (en)

Device for realising a roof opening seal

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für eine Durchführungsabdichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'étanchéité d'une ouverture de toit

Publication

EP 1256665 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810459 A

Priority

EP 01810459 A

Abstract (en)

The adaptable flashing component (12.2) is fixed to the partition piece (7) to provide a positive leakproof and insulated opening. Flashing (1) is additionally fixed to the piece (7) by a clamp rail (14), using flashing sheets. The partitioning piece (7) is fixed to the flashing (1) surface (3) and the sheet (2.1) grips over the piece (7) at their fold point (13). Additional components include flashing fixer nail (10) and roof covering (11).

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemässe Vorrichtung für eine Durchführungsabdichtung bei Dächern umfasst ein Element (1), welches zumindest einen Trennsteg (7) aufweist und an der Unterdachkonstruktion (2) fixierbar ist. Ein anpassbares Mittel (z. B. der Blechlappen 12.1 bzw. 12.2) wird einseitig umgefaltet (13) und am Trennsteg (7) kraftschlüssig befestigt. Zur Sicherung der Befestigung kann zusätzlich eine Klemmschiene (14) über die Umfaltung (13) und den Trennsteg (7) gesteckt werden. Anschliessend wird der Blechlappen (12.2) über die Dacheindeckung (11) gefaltet und an diese angepasst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/147; E04D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/02 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1475 (2013.01); E04D 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256665 A1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STRUB, MANFRED

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI