Global Patent Index - EP 1256666 A2

EP 1256666 A2 2002-11-13 - Safety guard

Title (en)

Safety guard

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité

Publication

EP 1256666 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253186 A

Priority

GB 0111165 A

Abstract (en)

A safety guard and particularly but not exclusively a scaffolding guard for construction sites and the like. The safety guard (130) comprises a screen (140); and at least one support member (150) mounted in or on the screen (140), the or each support member (150) having a hook-like profile (195) defining an open channel (200) for receiving a substantially horizontal pole (120) from which the screen (140) is to be hung; characterised by a stop (180) mounted on and projecting from the screen (140), the stop (180) being configured to restrict movement of the screen (140) relative to a substantially horizontal pole (120) when received in the open channel (200) of the or each support member (150). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/14 (2013.01); E04G 2005/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2137275 A 19841003 - HICKMAN & LOVE

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256666 A2 20021113; EP 1256666 A3 20040204; GB 0111165 D0 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070417

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061006

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLIS, JOHN HOWARD

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARCHER, ANDREW WILLIAM

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI