Global Patent Index - EP 1256669 A2

EP 1256669 A2 2002-11-13 - Lock cylinder

Title (en)

Lock cylinder

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 1256669 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005465 A

Priority

DE 10122125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10122125C1] The lock cylinder has a housing (1) with a lock core (22) and adaptor (30). A spring pin (18) fits in a recess (13) in one end of the housing bore and is connected by a through opening (12) to a guide channel. By pivoting of the lock core (22) from the change position, together with the inserted tool, the spring pin can be removed form engagement with an annular groove in a connecting seating of the cylinder core for withdrawal from the core.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schließzylinder mit einem Zylindergehäuse 1, einem diesem zugeordneten gebogenen Federstab 18, einen von diesem im Zylindergehäuse 1 gehaltenen Zylinderkern 22 und einem Adapter 30. Der gebogene Federstab 18 ist in einer Vertiefung 13 eines in einem vom zweiten axialen Ende 4 ausgehenden dritten Bohrungsabschnittes 9 angeordnet und über einen Durchbruch 12 mittels eines durch einen Führungskanal im Zylinderkern eingeführten Werkzeuges zugänglich, wobei durch Verschwenken des Zylinderkerns 22 ausgehend von der Wechselstellung zusammen mit dem eingeführten Werkzeug der Federstab außer Eingriff zu einer Ringnut in einem Kupplungsansatz des Zylinderkerns gebracht werden kann und aus dem Zylindergehäuse 1 herausziehbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4101978 C1 19920507

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10122125 C1 20020905; EP 1256669 A2 20021113; EP 1256669 A3 20040107; EP 1256669 B1 20060531; ES 2262720 T3 20061201

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-06 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-02-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-01-04 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARTIN LEHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20091030

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262720 T3

2006-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040529

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI