Global Patent Index - EP 1256673 A1

EP 1256673 A1 2002-11-13 - Lock

Title (en)

Lock

Title (de)

Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure

Publication

EP 1256673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009793 A

Priority

DE 10122368 A

Abstract (en)

The main lock body (1) contains a movably mounted bolt element (5). A manually operated drive mechanism has a linearly or rotarily movable operating element (7) in the form of a turning-knob and positioned on the exterior of the lock body. The operating element contains a combination- lock which moves with it. The combination lock possesses at least three combination setting-rings (10) turning on a pivot axle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schloß mit einem Schloßkörper (1) und zumindest einem darin beweglich gelagerten Riegelelement (5), welches durch eine manuell betätigbare Antriebsmechanik beaufschlagbar ist, die ein an der Außenseite des Schloßkörpers (1) angeordnetes, linear oder rotatorisch bewegliches Betätigungselement (7) aufweist, wobei in das Betätigungselement (7) ein gemeinsam mit diesem bewegbares Zahlenschließwerk (10) integriert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 37/02; E05B 1/00; E05B 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0013 (2013.01); E05B 13/103 (2013.01); E05B 15/0205 (2013.01); E05B 37/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256673 A1 20021113; DE 10122368 A1 20021114; DE 10122368 B4 20130711; DE 10122368 B9 20130801

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050114

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2003-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI