Global Patent Index - EP 1256678 A2

EP 1256678 A2 2002-11-13 - Locking means

Title (en)

Locking means

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 1256678 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076592 A

Priority

NL 1018015 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a lock (1), comprising a part (3) with an U-shaped cross section in which a cylinder lock (5) is mounted and a connecting piece (4) which connects in a locked situation both free ends of the legs or the side walls of the U-shaped part (3). For that purpose, the two legs or the side walls are each provided with a hole or a bore, through which the connecting piece (4) may slide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 67/36; B60D 1/60; B62D 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 67/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 67/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256678 A2 20021113; EP 1256678 A3 20050112; NL 1018015 C1 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-11-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 67/36 A

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 62D 53/08 B

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60D 1/60 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI