Global Patent Index - EP 1256681 A1

EP 1256681 A1 2002-11-13 - Fitting for a closure element for a wall opening

Title (en)

Fitting for a closure element for a wall opening

Title (de)

Beschlag für ein Verschlusselement für eine Maueröffnung

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour un élément de fermeture d'une ouverture dans un mur

Publication

EP 1256681 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02008899 A

Priority

AT 7062001 A

Abstract (en)

At least one part (3,4) of the fitting is adjustably fixed in relation to the closure element and has at least one attachment (2) gripping behind a back-tapered groove (15), with a pressure screw (6) fitting into a continuously threaded hole. The attachment is pressed against a groove-wall facing away from the closure element. The screw's end is supported against the closure element. The fitment in the form of a hinge (11) has a sleeve with pin-shaped counter-fitment (5).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Beschlag für ein Verschlußelement für eine Maueröffnung, insbesondere eine Fensteröffnung, ist mindestens ein Teil (3, 4) des Beschlages gegenüber dem Verschlußelement (10) verstell- und feststellbar gehalten, wobei ein gegenüber dem Verschlußelement (10) verstell- und feststellbar gehaltener Beschlagsteil (3) mindestens einen Ansatz (2) zum Hintergreifen einer gegenüber dem Verschlußelement (10) ortsfesten hinterschnittenen Nut (15) aufweist und eine Druckschraube (6) vorgesehen ist, die in eine durchgehende Gewindebohrung dieses Beschlagsteiles (3) eingreift. Die Druckschraube (6) durchsetzt die durchgehende Gewindebohrung vollständig, wobei sich zur Anpressung des mindestens einen Ansatzes (2) gegen eine vom Verschlußelement (10) abgewandte Wand der Nut (15) das die Gewindebohrung durchsetzende Ende der Druckschraube (6) gegen das Verschlußelement (10) oder gegen ein am Verschlußelement anliegendes Beschlagteil (4) abstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05D 5/0238 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256681 A1 20021113; EP 1256681 B1 20050330; DE 50202600 D1 20050504; ES 2239183 T3 20050916

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-01-14 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050401748

- Effective date: 20131104

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GRIESSER HOLDING AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AST ALU SYSTEM TECHNIK GMBH, NENZING, AT

- Document: DE 50202600

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GRIESSER HOLDING AG, AADORF, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AST ALU SYSTEM TECHNIK GMBH, NENZING, AT

- Document: DE 50202600

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202600

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MAUCHER BOERJES JEN, DE

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202600

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MAUCHER BOERJES JEN, DE

- Effective date: 20130308

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202600

- Representative's name: MAUCHER JENKINS, DE

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202600

- Representative's name: MAUCHER JENKINS, DE

- Effective date: 20130308

2013-06-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GRIESSER HOLDING AG, CH

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-05-24 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GRIESSER HOLDING AG

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202600

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MAUCHER BOERJES JEN, DE

2012-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2012-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GRIESSER HOLDING AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AST ALU SYSTEM TECHNIK GESMBH, AT

2012-06-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100420

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AST ALU SYSTEM TECHNIK GESMBH

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AST ALU SYSTEM TECHNIK GESMBH

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-10-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239183 T3

2005-09-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401748

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202600 P 20050504

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-20 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI