Global Patent Index - EP 1256685 A2

EP 1256685 A2 2002-11-13 - Door with at least one leaf

Title (en)

Door with at least one leaf

Title (de)

Tor mit mindestens einem Torfeld

Title (fr)

Porte avec au moins un vantail

Publication

EP 1256685 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009624 A

Priority

AT 7562001 A

Abstract (en)

Each of the two or more interlinked door-panels has a support frame consisting of frame profiled sections (1). Decorative strips (2) on the outside of the door are clipped onto at least one insulating insert (3,4) attached to the frame-profile. An infill panel (8) covering the interior of the support frame is held on the support frame. Each insulating strip has a detent (14,17) which is gripped from behind from the outer side (11). One of the insulating strips grips round a strip-shaped protuberance (6) belonging to the frame-profile; the other insulating strip rests on the outer side of the frame profile and fits into a back-tapered groove(12) in the frame profile

Abstract (de)

Tor mit mindestens einem Torfeld, insbesondere ein Falttor mit zwei oder mehreren untereinander gelenkig verbundenen Feldern, von denen jedes einen aus hinterschnittene sowie in der Hauptebene des Tores vorspringende Abschnitte (12, 6) aufweisende Rahmenprofilen (1) hergestellten Tragrahmen aufweist und an der Außenseite des Tores Zierleisten (2) vorgesehen sind, die auf mindestens einer auf dem Rahmenprofil (1) gehaltenen Isoliereinlage (3, 4; 3') aufgeklipst ist und eine den lichten Raum des Tragrahmens abdeckende Füllung (8) zwischen Halteleisten (7, 9) gehalten ist. Um einen einfachen Aufbau zu ermöglichen, ist vorgesehen, daß die Zierleiste (2) auf zwei Isoliereinlagen (3, 4; 3') aufgeklipst ist, von denen jede einen von der Außenseite (11) her hintergreifbare Rastvertiefungen (14, 17) aufweist und eine Isoliereinlage (3, 3') eine in der Hauptebene des Tores vorspringenden leistenartigen Vorsprung (6) des Rahmenprofiles (1) umgreift und die andere an der Außenseite (11) des Rahmenprofils (1) anliegt und in eine hinterschnittene Nut (12) des Rahmenprofiles (1) eingreift, wobei an einer dieser Isoliereinlagen (3, 4;3') eine Halteleiste (7) angeformt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 3/263; E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5821 (2013.01); E06B 3/305 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26387 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0982464 A1 20000301 - LINDPOINTNER TORE [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256685 A2 20021113; EP 1256685 A3 20030115; AT 409999 B 20021227; AT A7562001 A 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI