Global Patent Index - EP 1256686 A2

EP 1256686 A2 2002-11-13 - Door with at least one leaf

Title (en)

Door with at least one leaf

Title (de)

Tor mit mindestens einem Torfeld

Title (fr)

Porte avec au moins un vantail

Publication

EP 1256686 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009625 A

Priority

AT 7552001 A

Abstract (en)

Each of the interlinked door-panels has a frame (1). Decorative strip (2) on the outside of the door are clipped onto an insulating insert (3) held on the profiled frame. An infill panel (8) covers the interior of the support frame on which it is held. The frame, on the inside (23) of the support frame, has a protruding strip (6) extending towards the interior enclosed by the support frame. Each insulating insert has a holder strip(7) which has a detent (17) behind which grips a protuberance (18) on the decorative strip.

Abstract (de)

Ein Tor mit mindestens einem Torfeld, insbesondere ein Falttor umfaßt zwei oder mehrere untereinander gelenkig verbundene Torfelder, von denen jedes einen Tragrahmen aufweist, der aus Rahmenprofilen (1) hergestellt ist, wobei an der Außenseite des Tores Zierleisten (2) vorgesehen sind, die auf mindestens einer auf dem Rahmenprofil (1) gehaltenen Isoliereinlage (3) aufgeklipst sind, und eine den lichten Raum des Tragrahmens abdeckende Füllung (8) am Tragrahmen gehalten ist. Das Rahmenprofil (1) weist an der Innenseite (23) des Tragrahmens einen sich gegen das Innere des von dem Tragrahmen umschlossenen lichten Raumes erstreckenden leistenartigen Vorsprung (6) auf und an der/den Isoliereinlage(n) (3) ist jeweils eine Halteleiste (7) angeformt, wobei die Füllung (8) zwischen dem leistenartigen Vorsprung (6) und der Halteleiste bzw. den Halteleisten (7) festgelegt ist und an der Halteleiste bzw. den Halteleisten (7) eine von einem Rastvorsprung (18) der Zierleiste (2) hintergriffene Rastvertiefung (17) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 3/263; E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/305 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0982464 A1 20000301 - LINDPOINTNER TORE [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256686 A2 20021113; EP 1256686 A3 20030115; AT 409998 B 20021227; AT A7552001 A 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI