Global Patent Index - EP 1256708 A2

EP 1256708 A2 2002-11-13 - Fuel injection device for an internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for an internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoff-Einspritzvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1256708 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010375 A

Priority

DE 10122389 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection device (10) includes a casing (11) with a closed injection end (22) and with a recess (18, 20) running along it. There are two axial outlets at the injection end. The device has its compression cavities (e.g. 34) connected by a common control channel (32) differentiating the opening pressure of one of the valve elements (36) from the other (38).

Abstract (de)

Eine Kraftstoff-Einspritzvorrichtung (10) für Brennkraftmaschinen umfasst ein langgestrecktes Gehäuse (11) mit einem geschlossenen Einspritz-Ende (22). In dem Gehäuse verläuft in dessen Längsrichtung eine Ausnehmung (18, 20). Diese ist mit einem Kraftstoffeinlass (32) verbindbar. Ferner sind zwei axial voneinander beabstandete Austrittsöffnungen (24, 26) am Einspritz-Ende (22) vorgesehen. Zwei koaxiale Ventilelemente (36, 38) sind in der Ausnehmung (20) angeordnet und werden von jeweils mindestens einem Vorspannelement (58, 74) gegen einen entsprechenden Ventilsitz im Bereich der Austrittsöffnungen (24, 26) beaufschlagt. Die Ventilelemente (36, 38) weisen jeweils mindestens eine Druckfläche (40, 42, 46) auf. Die Ventilflächen (40, 42, 46) begrenzen jeweils einen Druckraum und sind so ausgerichtet, dass ihre Druckbeaufschlagung eine axiale Bewegung des entsprechenden Ventilelements (36, 38) bewirken kann. Um den Aufbau der Kraftstoff-Einspritzvorrichtung (10) zu vereinfachen, wird vorgeschlagen, dass die Druckräume mit einem gemeinsamen Steuerkanal (32) verbunden sind und sich der Öffnungsdruck eines Ventilelements (36, 38) von dem eines anderen Ventilelements (38, 36) unterscheidet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/08; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/182 (2013.01); F02M 45/086 (2013.01); F02M 2200/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256708 A2 20021113; EP 1256708 A3 20040114; DE 10122389 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/08 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/18 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI