Global Patent Index - EP 1256709 A2

EP 1256709 A2 2002-11-13 - Solenoid valve for controlling an injection valve of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Solenoid valve for controlling an injection valve of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Magnetventil zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Electrovanne de commande d'une soupape d'injection d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1256709 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008633 A

Priority

DE 10122168 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an electromagnet (29) and a movable armature with an armature plate (28) and a bolt (27) movable in an opening in a fixed slide part (34). A fuel control valve element (25) is movable with the armature and a shoulder (33) that limits bolt opening movement. The armature moves on the bolt in the closing direction under the effect of its inertial mass and the shoulder comes into contact with a stop surface (37) via an intermediate part (50).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Magnetventil zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine, welches einen Elektromagneten (29), einen beweglichen Anker mit einer Ankerplatte (28) und einem in einer Öffnung (40) eines ortsfesten Gleitstücks (34) gleitverschiebbar gelagerten Ankerbolzen (27), ein mit dem Anker bewegtes und mit einem Ventilsitz (24) zusammenwirkendes Steuerventilglied (25) zum Öffnen und Schließen eines Kraftstoffdurchgangs (17) und eine an dem von dem Elektromagneten (29) abgewandten Ende des Ankerbolzens (27) ausgebildete Schulter (33) umfaßt, die bei geöffnetem Magnetventil den Öffnungshub des Ankerbolzens (25) durch Anschlag an eine dem Ventilsitz (24) zugewandte Anschlagfläche (37) des Gleitstücks (35) begrenzt. Zur Erleichterung der Montage des Magnetventils wird vorgeschlagen, ein einteiliges oder mehrteiliges Zwischenstück an dem Ankerbolzen anzuordnen, so daß die an dem Ankerbolzen (27) ausgebildete Schulter (33) unter Zwischenlage des Zwischenstücks (50) an der Anschlagfläche (37) des Gleitstücks (35) zur Anlage gelangt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0015 (2013.01); F02M 63/0021 (2013.01); F02M 63/0022 (2013.01); F02M 63/0075 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); F02M 2200/80 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19708104 A1 19980903 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256709 A2 20021113; EP 1256709 A3 20041201; EP 1256709 B1 20080827; DE 10122168 A1 20021114; DE 50212693 D1 20081009; JP 2002371939 A 20021226; JP 3663389 B2 20050622; TW 575715 B 20040211

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080827

2009-08-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090528

2008-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212693 P 20081009

2008-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI