Global Patent Index - EP 1256717 A2

EP 1256717 A2 2002-11-13 - Shoe for swash plate type compressor

Title (en)

Shoe for swash plate type compressor

Title (de)

Kolbenschuh für einen Taumelscheibenkompressor

Title (fr)

Patin pour un compresseur à plateau en biais

Publication

EP 1256717 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02009381 A

Priority

JP 2001139539 A

Abstract (en)

A shoe for use in a swash plate type compressor, interposed between a swash plate and a piston, has a plane sliding surface, a spherical sliding surface and a side surface. The plane sliding surface, which is substantially a plane, slides with respect to the swash plate. The spherical sliding surface, which is substantially a part of sphere surface, slides with respect to the piston. The side surface is provided between the plane sliding surface and the spherical sliding surface. The side surface includes a chamfered surface adjacent to the plane sliding surface. An angle between the chamfered surface and the extended plane sliding surface ranges from 20 DEG to 80 DEG . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/10 (2006.01); F04B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0886 (2013.01); F05C 2251/14 (2013.01); F05C 2253/12 (2013.01); F05C 2253/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256717 A2 20021113; EP 1256717 A3 20030528; BR 0201687 A 20030311; CN 1385610 A 20021218; JP 2002332959 A 20021122; KR 20020086825 A 20021120; US 2003000379 A1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI