Global Patent Index - EP 1256722 A2

EP 1256722 A2 2002-11-13 - Centrifugal pump

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifugale

Publication

EP 1256722 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450114 A

Priority

AT 7592001 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a disk rotor electric motor for driving the pump directly connected to a pump impeller (6). A drive flange (18) protruding outwards in the radial direction on the outer periphery of the impeller has magnets (19) or windings (20) molded into it for contactlessly driving the impeller.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pumpe für flüssige Medien, insbesondere Kühlwasserpumpe für Brennkraftmaschinen mit innerer Verbrennung mit einem als Scheibenläufer ausgebildeten Elektromotor zum Antrieb der Pumpe, der mit einem Laufrad (6) der Pumpe in unmittelbarer Verbindung steht. Ein einfacher Aufbau und eine hohe Betriebssicherheit werden dadurch erreicht, dass am äußeren Umfang des Laufrads der Pumpe ein Antriebsflansch (18) in Radialrichtung nach außen vorragt, in dem Magnete (19) oder Wicklungen (20) eingeformt sind, um das Laufrad (6) berührungslos anzutreiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/0666 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256722 A2 20021113; EP 1256722 A3 20040102; EP 1256722 B1 20070221; AT 414064 B 20060815; AT A7592001 A 20051115; DE 50209511 D1 20070405; US 2002166520 A1 20021114; US 6835051 B2 20041228

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209511

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2012-01-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111202

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100503

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-09-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209511 P 20070405

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI