Global Patent Index - EP 1256743 A1

EP 1256743 A1 2002-11-13 - Transmission for a motorcycle

Title (en)

Transmission for a motorcycle

Title (de)

Schaltgetriebe für ein Motorrad

Title (fr)

Transmission pour motocyclettes

Publication

EP 1256743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02008775 A

Priority

DE 10122450 A

Abstract (en)

The gear shift includes a control device. This consists of a processor and a revs sensor (21, 22) for each transmission shaft (19, 20). The control device calculates the position of the dogs relative to the pockets of the switchable dog clutches from the position of the transmission shafts relative to each other and sets a time point for the engagement release before the synchronizing revs of the two transmission shafts has been reached.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein Schaltgetriebe für ein Motorrad, zur Drehmoment- und Drehzahlanpassung zwischen einem Antriebsmotor und einem Hinterrad des Motorrads, mit mindestens zwei Getriebewellen (19,20) mit mehreren Zahnradsätzen (7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18) unterschiedlicher Untersetzung, von denen jeweils ein Zahnrad als Festrad und das andere Zahnrad als Losrad auf der zugehörigen Getriebewelle gehalten ist und wobei jeweils das Losrad zur Drehmomentübertragung mit der zugehörigen Getriebewelle über eine unsynchronisierte schaltbare Klauenkupplung verbunden werden kann. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass eine Steuereinrichtung, mindestens bestehend aus einem Prozessor und je einem Drehzahlsensor (21,22) an den Getriebewellen, die Position von Klauen zu Taschen der schaltbaren Klauenkupplungen aus der Position der Getriebewellen zueinander, unter Berücksichtigung der Untersetzungsverhältnisse der einzelnen Gangstufen, berechnet und einen Zeitpunkt einer Einrückfreigabe bestimmt, der noch vor Erreichen der Synchrondrehzahl der beiden Getriebewellen liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 3/089; F16H 61/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/04 (2006.01); F16H 3/089 (2006.01); F16H 59/46 (2006.01); F16H 59/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/0403 (2013.01); B60Y 2200/12 (2013.01); F16H 3/089 (2013.01); F16H 59/46 (2013.01); F16H 59/68 (2013.01); F16H 2061/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256743 A1 20021113; EP 1256743 B1 20031217; DE 10122450 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060419

2005-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050428

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200149 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI