Global Patent Index - EP 1256769 A1

EP 1256769 A1 2002-11-13 - Cooling and/or heating units

Title (en)

Cooling and/or heating units

Title (de)

Kühl- und/oder Heizeinheiten

Title (fr)

Unités de chauffage et/ou de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1256769 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01304117 A

Priority

EP 01304117 A

Abstract (en)

Cooling unit for a refrigerated cooling system comprises an enclosure (2) housing a motor driven fan (4). At least two separate cooling coils (8) are mounted at different sides of the enclosure (2) the coils (8) being connected in parallel in a refrigeration circuit of the system so as to form the evaporator of the system. In use, the fan (4) draws air into the enclosure (2) via the coils (8) to be cooled thereby with the cooled air being discharged via an outlet (12) into appropriate ducting for distribution. The use of two or more separate coils to form the evaporator enables the size of the enclosure to be substantially reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/06 (2006.01); F25B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/067 (2013.01); F25B 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256769 A1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050217

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB GR IT PT

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI