Global Patent Index - EP 1256771 A1

EP 1256771 A1 2002-11-13 - VEHICLE INCORPORATING TWO HEAT EXCHANGERS

Title (en)

VEHICLE INCORPORATING TWO HEAT EXCHANGERS

Title (de)

FAHRZEUG UMFASSEND ZWEI WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

VÉHICULE COMPRENANT DEUX ÉCHANGEURS DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 1256771 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912901 A

Priority

  • JP 0001935 W
  • JP 20435499 A

Abstract (en)

In two or more heat exchangers (1), (2) disposed in parallel on the windward and leeward in a ventilating direction, tubes (3) of the heat exchanger (1) disposed on the windward in the ventilating direction have a height (hc) smaller than a height (hr) of tubes (4) of the heat exchanger (2) disposed on the leeward (hc < hr), and the two or more heat exchangers are integrally configured with a common member. And, the respective tubes (3), (4) of the two or more heat exchangers (1), (2) disposed in parallel have substantially the same space between them. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/053; B60H 1/32; F25B 39/04; F28F 1/02; F28F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 11/04 (2006.01); B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28F 1/12 (2006.01); F28F 3/00 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/128 (2013.01); F28D 1/0435 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256771 A1 20021113; EP 1256771 A4 20051109; EP 1256771 B1 20081022; DE 60040620 D1 20081204; JP 2001033193 A 20010209; JP 3625259 B2 20050302; WO 0106194 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120329

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040620 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTROL CORPORATION

2008-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VEHICLE INCORPORATING TWO HEAT EXCHANGERS

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060208

2005-11-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050927

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB