Global Patent Index - EP 1256773 A2

EP 1256773 A2 2002-11-13 - Device for disposing of debris filtered at the entrance of a heat exchanger

Title (en)

Device for disposing of debris filtered at the entrance of a heat exchanger

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entsorgung von am Eingang eines Wärmetauschers herausgefilterten Schmutzpartikeln

Title (fr)

Installation de récupération des débris arrêtés par un filtre à l'entrée d'un échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1256773 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02291039 A

Priority

FR 0106254 A

Abstract (en)

The rubbish filter for the heat exchanger is positioned at the inlet. The outlet side of the filter (11) has a collector (36) for washing water feeding a separator (37) with ducting (39) for cleaned water discharge. The water discharge duct has a hydro-ejector (50) itself connected to the heat exchanger outlet. The separator can be installed vertically, with the water outlet extending radially.

Abstract (fr)

Installation de récupération des débris arrêtés par un filtre à l'entrée d'un échangeur de chaleur : à la sortie du filtre (11), un collecteur (36) d'eau de lavage alimente un séparateur (37) muni d'une canalisation (39) de sortie d'eau sans débris à laquelle est raccordé un hydro-éjecteur (50) lui-même raccordé à la conduite de sortie (16) de l'échangeur (19). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 19/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B01D 29/90 (2006.01); B01D 29/92 (2006.01); B01D 29/94 (2006.01); B01D 46/10 (2006.01); F28F 19/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256773 A2 20021113; EP 1256773 A3 20030402; FR 2824629 A1 20021115; FR 2824629 B1 20030808; JP 2003042687 A 20030213; US 2002170704 A1 20021121; US 6637504 B2 20031028

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI