Global Patent Index - EP 1256774 A2

EP 1256774 A2 2002-11-13 - Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit

Title (de)

Pyrotechnische Zündeinrichtung mit integrierter Elekronikbaugruppe

Title (fr)

Allumeur pyrotechnique comportant un circuit électronique incorporé

Publication

EP 1256774 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009850 A

Priority

DE 10123284 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a pyrotechnic material (3) connected to an electrically ignitable ignition bridge (1) mounted on a carrier arrangement (2) with an electronic unit (6a-6c). The carrier arrangement is partly coated with shock damping elastic material (4), preferably leaving the bridge exposed. The device has pyrotechnic and electronic regions. The carrier arrangement is enclosed by a harder material (5) in the electronic region than the damping material in the pyrotechnic region.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine pyrotechnische Zündeinrichtung mit integrierter Elektronikbaugruppe vorgestellt, die in einen Pyrotechnikbereich mit einer Zündbrücke (1) und einer pyrotechnischen Wirkmasse (3) sowie einen Elektronikbereich mit der Elektronikbaugruppe unterteilt ist, wobei eine gemeinsame Trägeranordnung (2) für Zündbrücke und Elektronikbaugruppe vorgesehen ist, die im Pyrotechnikbereich teilweise mit einem stoßdämpfenden, elastischen Material (4) überzogen ist, jedoch im Elektronikbereich von einem gegenüber dem stoßdämpfenden Material im Pyrotechnikbereich härteren Material (5) umhüllt ist, so dass diese härtere Umhüllung im Elektronikbereich eine Abtrennung und einen Schutz der Elektronikbaugruppe bewirkt, während die weichere Umhüllung im Pyrotechnikbereich stoßabsorbierend wirkt. Die Trägeranordnung weist vorzugsweise eine Längsform mit der Zündbrücke an einem Ende und davon beabstandet der Elektronikbaugruppe auf dem anderen Ende sowie zusätzlich vorzugsweise Trennstellen zur Abtrennung des Pyrotechnikbereichs von der restlichen Trägeranordnung auf, so dass die von der stoßabsorbierenden Umhüllung nicht aufnehmbaren Kräfte zumindest nicht über die Trägeranordnung zur Elektronikbaugruppe weitergegeben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/12; F42C 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/121 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256774 A2 20021113; EP 1256774 A3 20030102; EP 1256774 B1 20060531; DE 10123284 A1 20021114; DE 50206962 D1 20060706; US 2002166473 A1 20021114; US 6644197 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206962 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI