Global Patent Index - EP 1256775 A2

EP 1256775 A2 2002-11-13 - Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit

Title (de)

Pyrotechnische Zündeinrichtung mit integrierter Elektronikbaugruppe

Title (fr)

Allumeur pyrotechnique comportant un circuit électronique incorporé

Publication

EP 1256775 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009851 A

Priority

DE 10123282 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a pyrotechnic region with pyrotechnic material (3) and an electrically ignitable ignition bridge (1), a separate electronic region protected from ignition effects containing an electronic unit (6a-c) and a bearer arrangement (2) in both regions carrying the electrically connected electronic unit and ignition device. The bearer arrangement has a mechanical decoupling point (23) between the pyrotechnic region parts and the rest of the bearer arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine pyrotechnische Zündeinrichtung mit integrierter Elektronikbaugruppe, insbesondere für Insassenschutzeinrichtungen in Kraftfahrzeugen, vorgestellt, die einen Pyrotechnikbereich (A) mit einer pyrotechnischen Wirkmasse (3) und einer elektrisch zündbaren Zündbrücke (1) sowie einen davon getrennten und so vor den Auswirkungen der Zündung geschützten Elektronikbereich mit einer Elektronikbaugruppe aufweist, wobei die Zündbrücke (1) als auch die Elektronikbaugruppe auf einer gemeinsamen Trägeranordnung angeordnet sind, die jedoch Entkopplungsstellen (23), beispielsweise Sollbruchstellen oder Biegestellen aufweist, so daß bei der Zündung der pyrotechnischen Wirkmasse auftretende Kräfte nicht über die Trägeranordnung in den Elektronikbereich weitergegeben bzw. auf vorgegebene Grenzbelastungen begrenzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/12; F42C 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/121 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256775 A2 20021113; EP 1256775 A3 20030102; EP 1256775 B1 20060531; DE 10123282 A1 20021114; DE 50206963 D1 20060706; US 2002166471 A1 20021114; US 6659010 B2 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206963 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI