Global Patent Index - EP 1256776 A1

EP 1256776 A1 2002-11-13 - Pyrotechnic igniting element on a circuit substrate through which it is linked to an electronic igniting component

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic igniting element on a circuit substrate through which it is linked to an electronic igniting component

Title (de)

Zündelement für pyrotechnische Wirkmassen auf einer Schaltungsträgeranordnung angeordnet und über diese mit einer Zündelektronikbaugruppe verbunden

Title (fr)

Elément d'ignition pyrotechnique sur un plaquette de circuiterie, à travers laquelle il est relie a un component élèctronique d'ignition

Publication

EP 1256776 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009852 A

Priority

DE 10123285 A

Abstract (en)

The ignition element (10) is mounted on a circuit carrier arrangement (2), via which it is connected to an ignition electronics (6) unit, and has a separate carrier body (11) with a contact arrangement (12) for making electrical contact between the ignition element and the circuit carrier arrangement. The ignition electronic unit consists of standard components with standardized dimensions for automatic component mounting machines.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Zündelement für pyrotechnische Wirkmassen vorgestellt. Das Zündelement ist auf einer Schaltungsträgeranordnung angeordnet und über die Schaltungsträgeranordnung mit einer Zündelektronikbaugruppe verbunden. Das Zündelement selbst weist jedoch zusätzlich einen separaten Trägerkörper auf, welcher Kontaktmittel zur elektrischen Kontaktierung des Zündelements mit der Schaltungsträgeranordnung aufweist. Der Trägerkörper weist dabei vorzugsweise standardisierte Abmaße und Kontaktmittel auf, so dass das Zündelement wie ein normales elektrisches Bauelement auf der Schaltungsträgeranordnung montiert werden kann. Insbesondere kann auf dem separaten Trägerkörper eine elektrisch zündfähige Schicht abgeschieden werden, welche durch das hitzebeständige und schlecht wärmeleitende Material des Trägerkörpers den Wirkungsgrad erhöht und die Schaltungsträgeranordnung deutlich besser vor den Einflüssen des Abbrands der pyrotechnischen Wirkmasse schützt.. Die zündfähige Schicht kann bezüglich der Kontaktmittel auf der Unterseite des Trägerkörpers auf einer Seitenfläche des Trägerkörpers und die Schaltungsträgeranordnung in Längsausrichtung von der pyrotechnischen Wirkmasse weg ausgerichtet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/12; F42C 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256776 A1 20021113; EP 1256776 B1 20060118; DE 10123285 A1 20021114; DE 50205621 D1 20060406; US 2002166472 A1 20021114; US 6644199 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090503

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060429

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205621 P 20060406

2006-02-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060118

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI