Global Patent Index - EP 1256908 A1

EP 1256908 A1 2002-11-13 - Security access enclosure

Title (en)

Security access enclosure

Title (de)

Sicherheits-Personenschleuse

Title (fr)

Sas pour le passage de personnes

Publication

EP 1256908 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02076796 A

Priority

AU PR488101 A

Abstract (en)

A security enclosure (10) for guarding access to a facility, said security enclosure (10) having an inner housing (11) supported by an outer housing (12) by sensing means which may be a load cell (34) or a spring (26B). There is provided a pin assembly (25) interconnecting the inner housing (11) and the outer housing (12), which is connected to the load cell (34) or spring (26B). When a load is imparted to the load cell or spring by a person gaining entry to the inner housing (11), access to the facility will be provided when the load is under or is equal to a prescribed value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00; E05G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 5/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00134 (2013.01); E05G 5/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256908 A1 20021113; AU PR488101 A0 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI