Global Patent Index - EP 1256911 A1

EP 1256911 A1 2002-11-13 - Securization method for a payment from a client to a merchant, associated location server and system

Title (en)

Securization method for a payment from a client to a merchant, associated location server and system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Sichern einer Zahlung von einem Kunden an einen Händler, entspechender Lokalisierungsserver und System

Title (fr)

Procédé de sécurisation d'un paiement d'un client à un commerçant, centre de localisation et système correspondants

Publication

EP 1256911 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02364021 A

Priority

FR 0106093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824407A1] Security method for payment between client and vendor, including transmission stage to management center, in a pre-defined protocol, for a payment request including client identity. The method has validation stage in which: (a) management center generates validation request, for clients attention, in a second protocol independent of first, to address specified by client; (b) a validation message or payment refusal transmission is made in clients name in second protocol. An Independent Claim is also included for: (1) a secure payment system. The client has a terminal with radio communication facility. The second protocol is SIP. The validation request is generated in the form of an 'INVITE' message. The clients terminal transmission use at least one of the following: (a) short messages SMS; telephone communication; electronic messages.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de sécurisation d'un paiement d'un client à un commerçant, comprenant une étape de transmission vers un centre de gestion, selon un premier protocole prédéfini, d'une requête de paiement comprenant au moins un identifiant dudit client. Selon l'invention, un tel procédé comprend une étape de validation selon laquelle : ledit centre de gestion génère une requête de validation, à l'attention dudit client, selon un second protocole indépendant dudit premier protocole, à une adresse spécifiée par ledit client ; on effectue une transmission au nom dudit client d'un message de validation ou de refus du paiement, selon ledit second protocole. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/08; G06F 17/60; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/425 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40 (2013.01); G06Q 20/4037 (2013.01); G07F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256911 A1 20021113; FR 2824407 A1 20021108; FR 2824407 B1 20030725; US 2002174068 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100130

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061016

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE FRANEAISE DU RADIOTELEPHONE-SFR

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEGETEL GROUPE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI