Global Patent Index - EP 1256913 A2

EP 1256913 A2 2002-11-13 - Packaged product vending machine equipped with anti-theft provision

Title (en)

Packaged product vending machine equipped with anti-theft provision

Title (de)

Mit einer Diebstahlssicherungseinrichtung ausgerüsteter Verkaufsautomat für verpackte Produkte

Title (fr)

Machine de vente de produits empaquetés ayant un dispositif anti-vol

Publication

EP 1256913 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02007815 A

Priority

IT PN20010035 A

Abstract (en)

Packaged-product vending machine comprising a cabinet-like outer casing (10) containing the products to be dispensed and provided with a hopper (14), or the like, for delivering and collecting the selected products. <??>The hopper (14) is connected to both the cabinet (10) and a swinging partition (25) by means of a toggle-lever mechanism (16), and the partition (25) is adapted to shut off the aperture through which the vended products pass from the interior of the cabinet (10) into the dispensing hopper (14), when the latter is in its open position. <??>The described solution according to the invention has outstanding characteristics as far as both ergonomics, i.e. convenience of use, and security are concerned. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/18; G07F 11/10; G07F 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/10 (2006.01); G07F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/10 (2013.01); G07F 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256913 A2 20021113; EP 1256913 A3 20050713; IT PN20010035 A1 20021108

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: N&W GLOBAL VENDING S.P.A.

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 11/18 A

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 11/10 B

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 11/16 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI