Global Patent Index - EP 1256916 A2

EP 1256916 A2 2002-11-13 - Theft prevention device

Title (en)

Theft prevention device

Title (de)

Diebstahlschutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de prévention de vols

Publication

EP 1256916 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02008081 A

Priority

IT TO20010428 A

Abstract (en)

An anti-theft prevention device is disclosed, that it is composed of at least two different elements (1, 3) with small sizes, in which such elements (1, 3) mutually interact by means of electromagnetic waves and/or low frequency radio waves, one element (1) (or 3) being of the emitting type (for example shaped as a pen) and the other element (3) (or 1) being of the receiving type (for example shaped as a credit card). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/1427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256916 A2 20021113; EP 1256916 A3 20030723; IT TO20010428 A1 20010806

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-05-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI