Global Patent Index - EP 1256929 A2

EP 1256929 A2 2002-11-13 - Tone generation operating device and electronic musical instrument using the same

Title (en)

Tone generation operating device and electronic musical instrument using the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Tonerzeugung und Gebrauch davon durch ein elektronisches Musikinstrument

Title (fr)

Dispositif de génération de note et instrument de musique électronique l'utilisant

Publication

EP 1256929 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010401 A

Priority

JP 2001137101 A

Abstract (en)

A player selects a tone with his one hand (100) and performs a tone generating operation with the other hand (200). The player electrically detects all operations with the other hand without using any tools and uses the detected signals as tone generation information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10H 1/34; G10H 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/18 (2006.01); G10H 1/00 (2006.01); G10H 1/32 (2006.01); G10H 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/342 (2013.01); G10H 1/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256929 A2 20021113; EP 1256929 A3 20031022; JP 2002333885 A 20021122

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061215

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI