Global Patent Index - EP 1256933 A2

EP 1256933 A2 2002-11-13 - Method and apparatus for controlling the operation of an emotion synthesising device

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling the operation of an emotion synthesising device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Emotionssynthesegeräts

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'un appareil de synthèse d'émotion

Publication

EP 1256933 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01402176 A

Priority

  • EP 01402176 A
  • EP 01401203 A
  • EP 01401880 A

Abstract (en)

The invention controls the operation of an emotion synthesising device (12), notably of the type where the emotion is conveyed on a sound, having at least one input parameter (Pi) whose value (Ei) is used to set a type of emotion to be conveyed, by making at least one parameter a variable parameter (VPi) over a determined control range, thereby to confer a variability in an amount of the type of emotion to be conveyed. <??>The variable parameter (VPi) can be made variable according to a variation model over the control range, the model relating a quantity of emotion control variable ( delta ) to the variable parameter, whereby said control variable is used to variably establish a value of said variable parameter. <??>Preferably the variation obeys a linear model, the variable parameter being made to vary linearly with a variation in a quantity of emotion control variable ( delta ). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 13/08; G10L 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 13/10 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256933 A2 20021113; EP 1256933 A3 20041013; EP 1256933 B1 20071121

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150814

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150814

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60131521

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131521 P 20080103

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 13/08 A

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 13/02 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI