EP 1256933 A3 20041013 - Method and apparatus for controlling the operation of an emotion synthesising device
Title (en)
Method and apparatus for controlling the operation of an emotion synthesising device
Title (de)
Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Emotionssynthesegeräts
Title (fr)
Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'un appareil de synthèse d'émotion
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 01402176 A 20010814
- EP 01401203 A 20010511
- EP 01401880 A 20010713
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1256933A2] The invention controls the operation of an emotion synthesising device (12), notably of the type where the emotion is conveyed on a sound, having at least one input parameter (Pi) whose value (Ei) is used to set a type of emotion to be conveyed, by making at least one parameter a variable parameter (VPi) over a determined control range, thereby to confer a variability in an amount of the type of emotion to be conveyed. <??>The variable parameter (VPi) can be made variable according to a variation model over the control range, the model relating a quantity of emotion control variable ( delta ) to the variable parameter, whereby said control variable is used to variably establish a value of said variable parameter. <??>Preferably the variation obeys a linear model, the variable parameter being made to vary linearly with a variation in a quantity of emotion control variable ( delta ). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G10L 13/02 (2006.01); G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 13/08 (2006.01); G10L 13/10 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 13/10 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5732232 A 19980324 - BRUSH II ABBOTT PURDY [US], et al
- [A] US 5860064 A 19990112 - HENTON CAROLINE G [US]
- [XA] SATO J ET AL: "Emotion modeling in speech production using emotion space", ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATION, 1996., 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TSUKUBA, JAPAN 11-14 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, 11 November 1996 (1996-11-11), pages 472 - 477, XP010212883, ISBN: 0-7803-3253-9
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0165, no. 32 (P - 1448) 30 October 1992 (1992-10-30)
- [A] YOSHINORI KITAHARA ET AL: "PROSODIC CONTROL TO EXPRESS EMOTIONS FOR MAN-MACHINE SPEECH INTERACTION", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, vol. E75 - A, no. 2, 1 February 1992 (1992-02-01), pages 155 - 163, XP000301808, ISSN: 0916-8508
- [A] IGNASI IRIONDO ET AL: "VALIDATION OF AN ACOUSTICAL MODELLING OF EMOTIONAL EXPRESSION IN SPANISH USING SPEECH SYNTHESIS TECHNIQUES", ISCA WORKSHOP ON SPEECH AND EMOTION, September 2000 (2000-09-01), pages 1 - 6, XP007005765
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1256933 A2 20021113; EP 1256933 A3 20041013; EP 1256933 B1 20071121
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01402176 A 20010814