Global Patent Index - EP 1256963 A2

EP 1256963 A2 2002-11-13 - Electrical resistor and method of manufacture

Title (en)

Electrical resistor and method of manufacture

Title (de)

Elektrischer Widerstand und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Résistance électrique et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1256963 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008944 A

Priority

DE 10122468 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a resistive element (1) consisting of a metal resistance alloy and two connection parts at a distance apart at opposite ends (3) of the resistive element made of as metal whose electrical conductivity is higher than that of the resistive alloy. The connection parts are tubular sleeve parts (4) enclosing the periphery of the resistance element that are formed by welded strip or tubular material. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a method of manufacturing an electrical resistance.

Abstract (de)

Zur Strommessung dienende SMD-Widerstände werden durch Zerteilen eines gezogenen Schichtverbunddrahtes hergestellt, der aus einem Kern (2) aus einer Widerstandslegierung und einem Mantel beispielsweise aus Kupfer besteht. Nach Entfernen eines Teils des Kupfermantels bleiben nur an den Enden des Widerstands als Anschlussteile dienende Mantelstücke (4) zurück. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 3/00; H01C 1/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/142 (2006.01); H01C 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 17/28 (2013.01); H01C 1/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256963 A2 20021113; EP 1256963 A3 20041222; DE 10122468 C1 20030320; US 2002167391 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-10-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01C 3/00 A

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01C 1/142 B

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISABELLENHUETTE HEUSLER GMBH & CO.KG

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI