Global Patent Index - EP 1256971 A2

EP 1256971 A2 2002-11-13 - Gas discharge lamp

Title (en)

Gas discharge lamp

Title (de)

Gasentladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe a décharge gazeuse

Publication

EP 1256971 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100454 A

Priority

DE 10122392 A

Abstract (en)

Gas discharge lamp has a capacitive coupling structure (2, 3) made from BaTiO3 ceramic material. Preferably the barium in the ceramic material is partially or completely replaced with lead. The ceramic material is doped at the titanium site with 0.01-1% manganese or doped with BaCo3 or doped with lead or titanium.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Gasentladungslampe mit mindestens einer kapazitiven Einkoppelstruktur (2,3) beschrieben, die sich dadurch auszeichnet, dass die Einkoppelstruktur (2,3) ein keramisches Material umfasst, das reines BaTiO3 aufweist. Insbesondere eine zusätzliche Dotierung von zumindest einem Teil von BaTiO3 mit Barium führt zu einem Material, dessen Curietemperatur und Sättigungspolarisation wesentlich höher und dessen Koerzitivfeldstärke wesentlich geringer ist, so dass eine Gasentladungslampe mit einer aus diesem Material hergestellten Einkoppelstruktur bei wesentlich höheren Temperaturen und einer geringeren Betriebsspannung betrieben werden kann. Weiterhin werden verschiedene Dotierungen des BaTiO3 mit Titan, Mangan und Blei beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); C04B 35/468 (2006.01); H01G 4/12 (2006.01); H01J 17/04 (2006.01); H01J 61/02 (2006.01); H01J 61/06 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 61/36 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01); H05B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/06 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256971 A2 20021113; EP 1256971 A3 20060125; CN 1384526 A 20021211; DE 10122392 A1 20021114; JP 2002352773 A 20021206; KR 20020085823 A 20021116; US 2002171375 A1 20021121; US 6744204 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI