Global Patent Index - EP 1256972 A2

EP 1256972 A2 2002-11-13 - Flat lighting device with a mirror surface

Title (en)

Flat lighting device with a mirror surface

Title (de)

Flache Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit Spiegelfläche

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage plat à surface réfléchissante

Publication

EP 1256972 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008313 A

Priority

DE 10122211 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) has a base plate and a front plate joined to an at least partly transparent vessel with an internal ionisable filling, whereby in a partial region of the vessel at least one of the two plates is at least partly provided with a mirror surface and an unmirrored part area of the vessel is formed to implement the illumination function.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine flache Beleuchtungsvorrichtung (1), umfassend eine Grundplatte (2) und eine Frontplatte (3), die ein zumindest teilweise transparentes Gefäß begrenzen das in seinem Innern eine ionisierbare Füllung aufweist. In einem Teilbereich des Gefäßes ist zumindest eine der beiden Platten (2,3) mindestens teilweise mit einer Spiegelfläche (9) versehen. Ein unverspiegelter Teilbereich (12) des Gefäßes ist für die Realisierung einer Beleuchtungsfunktion ausgebildet. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/35; A47G 1/02; H01J 61/067; H01J 61/16; H01J 61/30; H01J 61/78; H01J 61/92; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/02 (2006.01); H01J 61/02 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/025 (2013.01); A47G 1/02 (2013.01); H01J 61/305 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256972 A2 20021113; EP 1256972 A3 20051109; CA 2385407 A1 20021108; DE 10122211 A1 20021114; NO 20022190 A 20021111; NO 20022190 D0 20020507; US 2002180341 A1 20021205; US 6630769 B2 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070313

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI