Global Patent Index - EP 1257001 A1

EP 1257001 A1 2002-11-13 - Interface between a mobile radio device and its accessory device based on capacitive coupling for sharing ground planes to rise antenna gain of accessory device

Title (en)

Interface between a mobile radio device and its accessory device based on capacitive coupling for sharing ground planes to rise antenna gain of accessory device

Title (de)

Schnittstelle zwischen Mobilfunkgerät und Zubehörgerät basierend auf kapazitiver Kopplung zur gemeinsamen Nutzung der Masseflächen um den Antennengewinn des Zubehörgeräts zu erhöhen

Title (fr)

Interface entre un dispositif radio mobil et dispositif accessoire basé sur un couplage capacitif afin de partager les plans de masse augmentant le gain de l'antenne du dispositif accessoire

Publication

EP 1257001 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01111601 A

Priority

EP 01111601 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides an arrangement or interface (131) for capacitively coupling the ground plane (230) of a mobile device (200) with the ground plane (130,131) of its accessory device (100). Thus, the ground planes of both devices are shared. This results in an extended ground plane (130,131,230) of the accessory device (100) for rising the antenna gain of a patch antenna (120) incorporated in its housing (110). Hence, the accessory device can be further miniaturized without the drawback of lower antenna gain. The mobile device (200) can be a mobile telephone terminal, its accessory device can be a mobile positioning terminal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/48 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1257001 A1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI