Global Patent Index - EP 1257007 A2

EP 1257007 A2 2002-11-13 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1257007 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010575 A

Priority

IT TO20010072 U

Abstract (en)

An electric connector (1) having an insulating casing (3) defining a number of cavities (4) for housing respective electric terminals (5); primary retaining means (17) for retaining the terminals (5) inside the respective cavities (4); secondary retaining means (20) having a movable member (21) connectable to the casing (3) in a first direction (C) to determine correct engagement of the terminals (5) by the primary retaining means (17), and to prevent release of the terminals; and lock means (25) interposed between the casing (3) and the movable member (21) to respectively define, in the first direction (C), a preassembly position wherein the movable member (21) permits insertion of the terminals (5) inside the respective cavities (4), and a fully assembled position achievable when the terminals (5) are engaged correctly by the primary retaining means (17); the lock means (25) having at least a first and a second opening (28, 29) formed on the movable member (21), and at least one tooth (26) carried by the casing (3) and which selectively engages the first and the second.opening (28, 29) to define the preassembly position and the fully assembled position of the movable member (21) respectively; the first opening (28) and the tooth (26) defining a lock joint (31) in a second direction (B) opposite the first direction (C), to prevent full removal of the movable member (21) from the casing (3). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/422

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/422 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 13/4223 (2013.01); H01R 13/4365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1257007 A2 20021113; EP 1257007 A3 20031001; EP 1257007 B1 20050817; AT 302477 T 20050915; DE 60205525 D1 20050922; DE 60205525 T2 20060629; IT TO20010072 U1 20021111; IT TO20010072 V0 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 60205525

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

2014-08-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Effective date: 20140715

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 60205525

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, VERSAILLES, FR

- Document: DE 60205525

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60205525

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-09-09 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2011-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060510

2007-02-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060117

2005-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-11-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205525 P 20050922

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/436 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/422 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI