Global Patent Index - EP 1257010 A2

EP 1257010 A2 2002-11-13 - Cam cable clamping device

Title (en)

Cam cable clamping device

Title (de)

Nockenklemmvorrichtung für Kabel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage de câble par came

Publication

EP 1257010 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010370 A

Priority

IT MI20010938 A

Abstract (en)

A cable clamping device has a body (2), having a base (4) and a seat (5) for receiving an electric cable (6); and a clamping member (3). The clamping member (3) has a cam profile, and is movable angularly, with respect to the body (2), between a first position, in which a cable (6) can be slid inside the seat (5), and a second position, in which the cable (6) is gripped against a wall (7) of the seat (5). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5829 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1257010 A2 20021113; EP 1257010 A3 20030917; IT MI20010938 A1 20021108; IT MI20010938 D0 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI