Global Patent Index - EP 1257011 A2

EP 1257011 A2 2002-11-13 - Cable clamping device, particularly for clamping bundles of cables

Title (en)

Cable clamping device, particularly for clamping bundles of cables

Title (de)

Kabelklemmvorrichtung, insbesondere für die Halterung eines Kabelbaums

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage de câble, en particulier pour maintenir un faisceau de câbles

Publication

EP 1257011 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010371 A

Priority

IT MI20010941 A

Abstract (en)

A cable clamping device (1) including a base (2) having a seat (3) through which one or more electric cables (4), e.g. supply cables of an electric household appliance, are housed; and a clamping member (5), which is insertable inside the base, crosswise to the seat, through a mouth (6) formed in the base and directly facing the seat, to clamp the cables against a bottom wall (7) of the seat; the clamping member (5) being secured to the base (2) by at least one screw, and by a jack device (18) including a rib (20) having transverse teeth (21) and formed in one piece with the clamping member (5) on the opposite side to a hole (24) for receiving the at least one screw (25), and a recess (22) formed in the base, alongside the seat, to receive the whole length of the rib (20), and having, internally, at least one elastically deformable tooth (23) located so as to click onto the transverse teeth. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5829 (2013.01); H01R 13/5812 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1257011 A2 20021113; EP 1257011 A3 20030924; IT MI20010941 A1 20021108; IT MI20010941 D0 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-07-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI