Global Patent Index - EP 1257039 A2

EP 1257039 A2 2002-11-13 - Parallelogram shaped permanent magnet for brushless motor rotor

Title (en)

Parallelogram shaped permanent magnet for brushless motor rotor

Title (de)

Dauermagnet in Form eines Parallelogramms, besonders als Läufer für kollektorlose Motoren

Title (fr)

Aimant permanent en forme de parallélogramme pour rotor de moteur électrique sans collecteur

Publication

EP 1257039 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076415 A

Priority

US 85075301 A

Abstract (en)

A permanent magnet structure for use in brushless motors (36) is disclosed. In an exemplary embodiment of the invention, the magnet structure includes a parallelogram shaped body (72). The body (72) has an outer surface (74) and an inner surface (76), with the outer surface (74) and the inner surface (76) being arcuate in shape. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 29/00 (2006.01); H02K 1/27 (2006.01); H02K 15/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 1/278 (2013.01); H02K 2201/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1257039 A2 20021113; EP 1257039 A3 20041222; JP 2002374643 A 20021226; US 2002167241 A1 20021114; US 6713921 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061010

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI