Global Patent Index - EP 1257255 A1

EP 1257255 A1 2002-11-20 - THERAPEUTIC PRODUCT, USE AND FORMULATION THEREOF

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC PRODUCT, USE AND FORMULATION THEREOF

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHES PRODUKT, DESSEN GEBRAUCH UND HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT THERAPEUTIQUE, SON APPLICATION ET SA FORMULATION

Publication

EP 1257255 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01914449 A

Priority

  • US 0105758 W
  • US 18454600 P
  • US 68722900 A
  • US 68723600 A
  • US 68723500 A
  • US 68723700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162229A1] A therapeutic product comprising: a first therapeutic dosage form, a second therapeutic dosage form, and a third therapeutic dosage form, each of said first, second and third therapeutic dosage forms comprising at least one therapeutic agent and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier, said three dosage forms having different release profiles, said therapeutic product reaching a Cmax in less than about twelve hours wherein said therapeutic is an antibiotic, an anti-fungal, an anti-viral or an anti-neoplastic agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/14; A61K 9/127; A61K 9/16; A61K 9/20; A61K 9/22; A61K 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/22 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/4196 (2006.01); A61K 31/43 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/513 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 31/573 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61K 31/7052 (2006.01); A61K 31/7072 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7048 (2013.01); A61K 9/2081 (2013.01); A61K 9/5084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162229 A1 20010830; AU 3983801 A 20010903; CA 2400784 A1 20010830; CA 2400784 C 20090519; EP 1257255 A1 20021120; EP 1257255 A4 20080730; JP 2003523378 A 20030805; JP 2012001528 A 20120105; JP 5377465 B2 20131225

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150305

2015-03-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHIONOGI INC.

2009-11-11 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20091009

2008-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIDDLEBROOK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIDDLEBROOK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2008-07-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080630

2006-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUDNIC, EDWARD, M.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISBISTER, JAMES, D.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TREACY, DONALD, J., JR.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WASSINK, SANDRA, E.

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020824

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI