Global Patent Index - EP 1257365 A1

EP 1257365 A1 2002-11-20 - DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A COATING PRODUCT AND SPRAYING ROTARY ELEMENT FOR SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A COATING PRODUCT AND SPRAYING ROTARY ELEMENT FOR SAME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPRITZEN VON BESCHICHTUNGSMITTELN UND ROTIERENDES ZERSTÄUBUNGSELEMENT FÜR DIESE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE PRODUIT DE REVETEMENT ET ELEMENT ROTATIF DE PULVERISATION POUR UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1257365 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907818 A

Priority

  • FR 0100459 W
  • FR 0002112 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162396A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a spraying rotary element, such as a bowl (3), and driving means, such as a rotor (1) capable of driving the spraying element in rotation. It further comprises magnetic coupling means (2, 4) between the rotary element (3) and the driving means (1). An air gap (e) is provided between the coupling means (2, 4) which advantageously include at least a magnet (4) associated with a looping ring (2). The magnet (4) can be fitted on the rotor (1) and/or on the bowl.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1042 (2013.01); B05B 3/1014 (2013.01); B05B 3/1035 (2013.01); Y10S 239/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162396A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162396 A1 20010830; AU 3569401 A 20010903; BR 0107936 A 20030121; BR 0107936 B1 20090505; CA 2399624 A1 20010830; CA 2399624 C 20090728; CN 1189250 C 20050216; CN 1404417 A 20030319; DE 60127655 D1 20070516; DE 60127655 T2 20071213; EP 1257365 A1 20021120; EP 1257365 B1 20070404; ES 2283392 T3 20071101; FR 2805182 A1 20010824; FR 2805182 B1 20020920; JP 2003524523 A 20030819; JP 4791672 B2 20111012; TW 505544 B 20021011; US 2001015386 A1 20010823; US 6592054 B2 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAMES KREMLIN, FR

- Effective date: 20171010

2017-10-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SAMES KREMLIN

- Effective date: 20170928

2017-08-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170706 AND 20170715

2017-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAMES KREMLIN, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAMES TECHNOLOGIES, MEYLAN, FR

- Document: DE 60127655

2017-06-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60127655

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60127655

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2015-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2283392 T3

2007-07-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070425

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127655 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMES TECHNOLOGIES

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI