Global Patent Index - EP 1257373 A1

EP 1257373 A1 2002-11-20 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CASTING A WORKPIECE AND WORKPIECE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CASTING A WORKPIECE AND WORKPIECE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM GIESSEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS UND WERKSTÜCK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MOULAGE D'UNE PIECE ET PIECE AINSI OBTENUE

Publication

EP 1257373 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01921269 A

Priority

  • EP 01921269 A
  • EP 0101014 W
  • EP 00104001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1127635A1] The invention relates to a device for casting a workpiece, especially a turbine blade with inner cooling, comprising a casting cavity (1) in which casting cores (2) which produce channels (3) that pass through the workpiece are provided. The aim of the invention is to improve a device of this type in such a way that there are no poorly cooled areas present in the workpiece. To this end, the casting cores (2) are placed in the casting cavity (1) in such a way that they rest against each other loosely.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01); B22C 9/22 (2006.01); B22D 29/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/10 (2013.01); B22D 25/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162414A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1127635 A1 20010829; CN 1273240 C 20060906; CN 1406160 A 20030326; DE 50100652 D1 20031023; EP 1257373 A1 20021120; EP 1257373 B1 20030917; JP 2003525125 A 20030826; US 2003010469 A1 20030116; US 2004140079 A1 20040722; US 6712120 B2 20040330; WO 0162414 A1 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090131

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100652 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR