Global Patent Index - EP 1257392 A1

EP 1257392 A1 2002-11-20 - SHAVING AID STRIP FOR RAZOR CARTRIDGE

Title (en)

SHAVING AID STRIP FOR RAZOR CARTRIDGE

Title (de)

RASIERHILFESTREIFEN FÜR RASIERKLINGENEINHEIT

Title (fr)

LAMELLE AMELIORANT LE RASAGE POUR CARTOUCHE DE RASOIR

Publication

EP 1257392 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906985 A

Priority

  • US 0103679 W
  • US 50662900 A
  • US 73726700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160572A1] The present invention is directed to a razor cartridge (14) with a solid polymeric shaving aid strip (22). The razor cartridge has a blade (18) (one or more) and a skin-engaging portion in proximity of the blade. The skin-engaging portion includes a solid polymeric shaving aid strip (22) having an upper exposed surface which contacts the skin during shaving. The shaving aid strip includes a first exposed lengthwise-extending portion (24) containing a lubricous water-soluble polymer and an adjacent, second exposed lengthwise-extending portion (26) containing a lubricous water-soluble polymer. The first portion contains a greater amount of the lubricous water-soluble polymer than the second portion, and the first portion is adapted to wear at a faster rate than the second portion during shaving. This construction enables the strip to release more of the lubricous water-soluble polymer for a longer time period (i.e., for more shaves) than conventional shaving aid strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/44 (2006.01); B26B 21/14 (2006.01); B26B 21/40 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B26B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/443 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160572A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160572 A1 20010823; AT 253435 T 20031115; AU 3482201 A 20010827; AU 780224 B2 20050310; BR 0108457 A 20030401; BR 0108457 B1 20090505; CA 2398105 A1 20010823; CA 2398105 C 20070911; DE 60101151 D1 20031211; DE 60101151 T2 20040902; EG 22808 A 20030831; EP 1257392 A1 20021120; EP 1257392 B1 20031105; ES 2204832 T3 20040501; IL 150871 A 20070617; IL 150871 D0 20030212; JP 2003522618 A 20030729; JP 5474270 B2 20140416; MX PA02007580 A 20021213; RU 2002124776 A 20040320; RU 2248875 C2 20050327; TW 544390 B 20030801

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170622 AND 20170628

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: THE GILLETTE COMPANY LLC, US

- Effective date: 20170203

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THE GILLETTE COMPANY LLC (N. D. GES. D. STAATE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THE GILLETTE CO., BOSTON, MASS., US

- Document: DE 60101151

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120206

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204832 T3

2004-04-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031105

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-02-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-02-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-02-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-02-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040205

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60101151 P 20031211

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI