Global Patent Index - EP 1257422 A1

EP 1257422 A1 2002-11-20 - INK JET PRINT HEAD HAVING OFFSET NOZZLE ARRAYS

Title (en)

INK JET PRINT HEAD HAVING OFFSET NOZZLE ARRAYS

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKKOPF MIT VERSETZTEN DÜSENREIHEN

Title (fr)

TETE D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE DOTEE DE RESEAUX DE BUSES DECALES

Publication

EP 1257422 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906973 A

Priority

  • US 0103631 W
  • US 49900800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156798A1] An ink jet printing apparatus includes a print head having a nozzle array (N1-N320) and which scans across the print medium in a scan direction. The nozzle array includes first and second substantially columnar nozzle arrays (34, 36), each aligned with a print medium advance direction. Each substantially columnar array has an upper subarray pair including an upper left and an upper right subarray of nozzles (C84, C83; C74, C73), each including a substantially linear arrangement of n nozzles having equal nozzle-to-nozzle spacings. Each upper right subarray is offset from the corresponding upper left subarray in the scan direction by a first spacing and in the print medium advance direction by one-half of the nozzle-to-nozzle spacing. The second substantially columnar array of offset from the first substantially columnar array in the second direction by a second spacing and in the print medium advance direction by one-forth of the nozzle-to-nozzle spacing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/04505 (2013.01); B41J 2/04543 (2013.01); B41J 2/04573 (2013.01); B41J 2/0458 (2013.01); B41J 2/14072 (2013.01); B41J 2/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156798 A1 20010809; AU 3481101 A 20010814; CN 1213870 C 20050810; CN 1411410 A 20030416; DE 60119497 D1 20060614; DE 60119497 T2 20061123; DE 60136865 D1 20090115; EP 1257422 A1 20021120; EP 1257422 A4 20030521; EP 1257422 B1 20060510; EP 1564000 A1 20050817; EP 1564000 B1 20081203; EP 1852259 A1 20071107; HK 1051517 A1 20051209; JP 2003521401 A 20030715; JP 2007062385 A 20070315; US 2003076381 A1 20030424; US 6502920 B1 20030107; US 6742866 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60119497 P 20060614

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-05-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI