Global Patent Index - EP 1257447 A1

EP 1257447 A1 2002-11-20 - WIPER BLADE FOR CLEANING GLASS SURFACES ON MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

WIPER BLADE FOR CLEANING GLASS SURFACES ON MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

WISCHBLATT ZUM REINIGEN VON SCHEIBEN AN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN

Title (fr)

RACLETTE D'ESSUIE-GLACE SERVANT A NETTOYER LES VITRES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1257447 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01923590 A

Priority

  • DE 10007810 A
  • EP 0101910 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160666A1] The invention relates to a wiper blade (1) for cleaning glass surfaces on vehicles, especially motor vehicles. The inventive wiper blade consists of an elongated wiper strip (2) consisting of an elastic rubber material and at least one spring bar (3) that is connected to the wiper strip and is curved in such a way that the wiper strip is provided with a different curvature on both sides (1', 1'') of a connecting element (9) for connecting to a wiper blade arm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/38 (2013.01); B60S 1/3867 (2013.01); B60S 2001/382 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160666 A1 20010823; BR 0108523 A 20030415; CN 1404449 A 20030319; DE 10007810 A1 20010823; EP 1257447 A1 20021120; JP 2003525800 A 20030902; US 2003009842 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR