Global Patent Index - EP 1257475 A1

EP 1257475 A1 2002-11-20 - MOULDED TUBULAR CARTRIDGE WITH CONTROLLED TEARAWAY OPENING

Title (en)

MOULDED TUBULAR CARTRIDGE WITH CONTROLLED TEARAWAY OPENING

Title (de)

GEFORMTE ROHRFÖRMIGE KARTUSCHE MIT KONTROLLIERTER ABBRECHBARER ÖFFNUNG

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE TUBULAIRE MOULEE A OUVERTURE DECHIRABLE CONTROLEE

Publication

EP 1257475 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907738 A

Priority

  • FR 0100372 W
  • FR 0001589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158769A1] The invention concerns a cylindrical cartridge (1) made of moulded material for use in a grease dispenser, closed on one side with a cap and the other with a frangible lid (2), characterised in that the lid (2) shaped like a disc (4) enclosed with a skirt (5) extending thereabove, over a constant height h, is secured to the end of the cartridge by a tearaway film (6) linking it to the outer edge (5a) of the skirt (5) which comprises a cut (7) over its length extending on the disc to form a radial cutout (8) whereof the outer edges support two equal vertical flanks (9), arranged facing each other, secured to the sides of the cutout (7) edges and linked at their free edges by a tearaway film (10) providing the lid with tightness, a thread (11) emerging from the flanks (9) to form the pull-ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/32 (2006.01); B65D 17/34 (2006.01); B65D 17/40 (2006.01); B65D 17/50 (2006.01); B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B65D 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/4011 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158769A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158769 A1 20010816; AT 272545 T 20040815; AU 3563501 A 20010820; CA 2399617 A1 20010816; DE 60104656 D1 20040909; DE 60104656 T2 20050825; DK 1257475 T3 20041206; EP 1257475 A1 20021120; EP 1257475 B1 20040804; ES 2227133 T3 20050401; FR 2804657 A1 20010810; FR 2804657 B1 20020503; US 2003183634 A1 20031002; US 6779675 B2 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-05-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227133 T3

2005-02-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2004-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60104656 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI