Global Patent Index - EP 1257479 A1

EP 1257479 A1 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIODEGRADABLE, RECESSED MOULDED RECEPTACLE BODIES BY BAKING A BAKING MATERIAL AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIODEGRADABLE, RECESSED MOULDED RECEPTACLE BODIES BY BAKING A BAKING MATERIAL AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER, VERTIEFTER AUFNAHMEFORMKÖRPER DURCH BACKEN EINER BACKMASSE UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE CORPS MOULES DE RECEPTION CREUX BIODEGRADABLES, PAR CUISSON D'UNE MATIERE A CUIRE, ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1257479 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915270 A

Priority

  • DE 10007986 A
  • EP 0101750 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162620A1] The invention relates to a method for producing biodegradable, recessed moulded receptacle bodies (18) by baking an especially cellulose fibre-based baking material. According to this method, the baking material is simultaneously baked into several moulded receptacle bodies (18) between an upper and a lower baking mould in one baking operation. The baking material is baked into a flat body (12) between the two baking moulds, this flat body containing the moulded receptacle bodies (18) integrally and having a continuous closed surface. The moulded receptacle bodies (18) are then separated from the flat body (12). The advantages of producing flat bodies (12) of this kind lie in the handling during the removal of the flat bodies (12) from the baking moulds and during the subsequent surface-coating of the flat bodies (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/46; A21D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A21D 13/00 (2006.01); B65D 65/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/466 (2013.01); A21D 13/47 (2017.01); Y02W 90/13 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162620A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162620 A1 20010830; AU 4241701 A 20010903; CA 2400792 A1 20010830; DE 10007986 A1 20010830; EP 1257479 A1 20021120; US 2003155682 A1 20030821

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-10-08 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR