Global Patent Index - EP 1257482 A1

EP 1257482 A1 2002-11-20 - HIGH ENERGY SHOCK ABSORBING WALL STRUCTURE AND CONTAINER USING SAME

Title (en)

HIGH ENERGY SHOCK ABSORBING WALL STRUCTURE AND CONTAINER USING SAME

Title (de)

WANDSTRUKTUR ZUR ABSORPTION VON STÖSSEN HOHER ENERGIE UND BEHÄLTER, DIE EINE SOLCHE STRUKTUR ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE PAROI AMORTISSEUSE DE CHOC A HAUTE ENERGIE ET CONTENEUR UTILISANT UNE TELLE STRUCTURE

Publication

EP 1257482 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907782 A

Priority

  • FR 0100418 W
  • FR 0001833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160713A1] The invention concerns a shock absorbing wall structure for equipping transport containers likely to fall heavily, generating very high energy on impact. It mainly consists of several layers of an alveolar support structure (7, 7N, 7N+1) wherein are regularly positioned some metal studs (5, 5N, 5N+1). The latter are positioned offset from one layer to the next, so as to provide uniform spaces wherein they can expand on a possible impact. The invention is particularly applicable to transport containers, in particular for fuel pencils of nuclear power plants and so-called type C containers (Hazardous Material Transport Regulation-1996 Edition-IAEA, Vienna).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/107; G21F 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/14 (2006.01); B65D 81/107 (2006.01); G21F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/08 (2013.01); B65D 81/107 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/303 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/304 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160713A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160713 A1 20010823; EP 1257482 A1 20021120; EP 1257482 B1 20040506; FR 2804941 A1 20010817; FR 2804941 B1 20020503; US 2003015541 A1 20030123; US 6953125 B2 20051011

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090214

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090214

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI