Global Patent Index - EP 1257565 A1

EP 1257565 A1 2002-11-20 - MUCIN-1 DERIVED ANTIGENS AND THEIR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY

Title (en)

MUCIN-1 DERIVED ANTIGENS AND THEIR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY

Title (de)

VON MUCIN-1 ABGELEITETE ANTIGENE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN DER IMMUNTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

ANTIGENES DERIVES DE MUCINE-1 ET LEUR UTILISATION EN IMMUNOTHERAPIE

Publication

EP 1257565 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01902160 A

Priority

  • AU 0100090 W
  • AU PQ536900 A
  • US 59387000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157068A1] Peptides and polypeptides capable of eliciting the immune response are disclosed which comprise an amino acid sequence substantially corresponding to that of an epitope of the non-VNTR, non-leader region of mucin. The peptides or polypeptides are useful themselves, or in the form of fusion proteins or conjugate compounds with carbohydrate polymers, in the prevention or treatment of disease states, particularly carcinomas such as adenocarcinomas. DNA vaccines and uses of the peptides and polypeptides for pulsing dentritic cells for <i>in vivo</i> transfer are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/06; A61K 38/08; A61K 39/395; A61K 39/44; A61P 35/00; C07K 7/08; C07K 14/82; C07K 16/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4727 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157068 A1 20010809; CA 2399026 A1 20010809; EP 1257565 A1 20021120; EP 1257565 A4 20050406; JP 2003533181 A 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120901

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-04-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050221

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI