Global Patent Index - EP 1257580 A2

EP 1257580 A2 2002-11-20 - HUMAN ION CHANNELS

Title (en)

HUMAN ION CHANNELS

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE IONENKANÄLE

Title (fr)

CANAUX IONIQUES HUMAINS

Publication

EP 1257580 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01910631 A

Priority

  • US 0104644 W
  • US 18232500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160864A2] The present invention provides novel ion channel polypeptides and polynucleotides which identify and encode them. In addition, the invention provides expression vectors, host cells and methods for their production. The invention also provides methods for the identification of ion channel agonists/antagonists, useful for the treatment of human diseases and conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160864A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160864 A2 20010823; WO 0160864 A3 20020328; AU 3822101 A 20010827; EP 1257580 A2 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070317

2007-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020922

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020912;LT PAYMENT 20020912;LV PAYMENT 20020912;MK PAYMENT 20020912;RO PAYMENT 20020912;SI PAYMENT 20020912