Global Patent Index - EP 1257612 A2

EP 1257612 A2 2002-11-20 - SCINTILLATOR CRYSTALS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, USE THEREOF

Title (en)

SCINTILLATOR CRYSTALS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, USE THEREOF

Title (de)

SCINTILLATORKRISTALLE, VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG DIESER KRISTALLE

Title (fr)

CRISTAUX SCINTILLATEURS, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, APPLICATION DE CES CRISTAUX

Publication

EP 1257612 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01905799 A

Priority

  • EP 0101838 W
  • NL 1014401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160945A2] The invention concerns an inorganic scintillator material of general composition M>1-x<Ce>x<Br>3<, wherein: M is selected among lanthanides or lanthanide mixtures of the group consisting of La, Gd, Y in particular among lanthanides or lanthanide mixtures of the group consisting of La, Gd; and x is the molar rate of substitution of M with cerium, x being not less than 0.01 mol % and strictly less than 100 mol %. The invention also concerns a method for growing such a monocrystalline scintillator material, and the use of same as component of a scintillating detector for industrial and medical purposes or in the oil industry.

[origin: WO0160945A2] The invention concerns an inorganic scintillator material of general composition M1-xCexBr3, wherein: M is selected among lanthanides or lanthanide mixtures of the group consisting of La, Gd, Y in particular among lanthanides or lanthanide mixtures of the group consisting of La, Gd; and x is the molar rate of substitution of M with cerium, x being not less than 0.01 mol % and strictly less than 100 mol %. The invention also concerns a method for growing such a monocrystalline scintillator material, and the use of same as component of a scintillating detector for industrial and medical purposes or in the oil industry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 11/85; C01F 17/00; G01T 1/202

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/20 (2006.01); C01F 17/00 (2006.01); C09K 11/00 (2006.01); C09K 11/08 (2006.01); C09K 11/77 (2006.01); C09K 11/85 (2006.01); C30B 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/2023 (2013.01); C01F 17/0056 (2013.01); C01F 17/0068 (2013.01); C09K 11/7772 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160945A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160945 A2 20010823; WO 0160945 A3 20020228; AT 284436 T 20041215; AT 299171 T 20050715; AU 3378401 A 20010827; AU 3740001 A 20010827; CA 2398849 A1 20010823; CA 2398952 A1 20010823; CN 100413939 C 20080827; CN 1277902 C 20061004; CN 1404522 A 20030319; CN 1404523 A 20030319; DE 60107659 D1 20050113; DE 60107659 T2 20051208; DE 60111827 D1 20050811; DE 60111827 T2 20060427; EP 1255796 A2 20021113; EP 1255796 B1 20050706; EP 1257612 A2 20021120; EP 1257612 B1 20041208; ES 2232596 T3 20050601; ES 2244587 T3 20051216; IL 150717 A 20060905; IL 150717 D0 20030212; IL 150719 A 20070308; IL 150719 D0 20030212; JP 2003523446 A 20030805; JP 2004500462 A 20040108; JP 2012177120 A 20120913; JP 5112589 B2 20130109; JP 5694987 B2 20150401; KR 100706114 B1 20070411; KR 100706705 B1 20070413; KR 20030003225 A 20030109; KR 20030003226 A 20030109; NL 1014401 C2 20010904; UA 75066 C2 20021216; UA 75591 C2 20021216; US 2004149917 A1 20040805; US 2004238747 A1 20041202; US 2006197026 A1 20060907; US 2006197027 A1 20060907; US 2007210256 A1 20070913; US 7067815 B2 20060627; US 7067816 B2 20060627; US 7233006 B2 20070619; US 7250609 B2 20070731; US 7479637 B2 20090120; WO 0160944 A2 20010823; WO 0160944 A3 20020214

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180206

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-03-26 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232596 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-03-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107659 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI