Global Patent Index - EP 1257614 A1

EP 1257614 A1 2002-11-20 - PETROLEUM DISTILLATION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (en)

PETROLEUM DISTILLATION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (de)

PETROLEUM DESTILLATIONSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DISTILLATION DE PETROLE

Publication

EP 1257614 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01903049 A

Priority

  • US 0101049 W
  • US 17634200 P
  • US 17876200 P
  • US 53198900 A
  • US 63343900 A
  • US 63361200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151588A1] In a distillation control system, a nuclear magnetic resonance (NMR) sensor identifies the composition of petroleum distillates from a distillation tower, and preferably also identifies the composition of the input feed method. This information is processed to obtain estimates of values of selected properties of the distillates and the feed. These values are provided to a multivariate controller, together with a setpoint of desired quality factors selected on the basis of competitive market forces, environmental regulations and economic factors including feed and product prices and operating cost. On the basis of the NMR measured values of selected quality properties, the multivariate controller generates values of manipulated operating variables that, when applied to the distillation system, adjust the distillation operation to reduce differences between the controlled variables and their respective setpoints. The ultimate values of the operating variables are determined, preferably in conjunction with an optimizer so that product qualities are maintained and the tower is operated in an economically optimum manner subject to specific characteristics of the refinery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 7/12; B01J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C10G 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0006 (2013.01); B01J 19/0033 (2013.01); C10G 7/12 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00168 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00186 (2013.01); G01N 24/08 (2013.01); G01N 24/085 (2013.01); G01R 33/4625 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151588A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151588 A1 20010719; WO 0151588 A8 20011101; AU 2940801 A 20010724; AU 3091901 A 20010724; CA 2397555 A1 20010719; CA 2397566 A1 20010719; CN 1422324 A 20030604; CN 1427877 A 20030702; EP 1254197 A1 20021106; EP 1257614 A1 20021120; WO 0151589 A1 20010719; WO 0151589 A8 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040406

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOXBORO NMR LTD

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KARG, RANDAL, W.

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLINKSCALES, THOMAS, A.

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GIAMMATTEO, PAUL J.

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EDWARDS, JOHN C.

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI